OK HB3399 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; curricular standards; emergency.
Title
Schools; curricular standards; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/05/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 32 Nays: 9 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 10 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider emergency tabled |
2014-05-23 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 18; Ayes: 68 Nays: 19 |
2014-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols, Walker, Derby, Shannon |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | Emergency added |
2014-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Newberry |
2014-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sears |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Brecheen, Ford, Sykes, Dahm, Ivester, Ellis |
2014-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2014-04-02 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-01 | Senate | coauthored by Marlatt, Griffin, David, Bingman |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-24 | Senate | coauthored by Branan, Shortey, Sharp |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-17 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley, Sykes |
2014-03-17 | Senate | coauthored by Brumbaugh |
2014-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 12 |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Bennett, Ortega, McCullough |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson |
2014-02-26 | House | Remove Representative Nelson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hickman |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 11 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 11 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 507 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508B | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508C | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 516 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 207 | New Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |