OK HB3363 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; providing procedures for governing body to abate public nuisance; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; providing procedures for governing body to abate public nuisance; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to General Government |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3 |
2014-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 112 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 22 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |