OK HB3346 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Consumer credit; modifying provisions related to disclosures and the Consumer Credit Protection Act; repealer; effective date; emergency.
Title
Consumer credit; modifying provisions related to disclosures and the Consumer Credit Protection Act; repealer; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Armes |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14A | 2 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 2 | 302 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 302 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |