OK HB3294 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; Personnel Act; changing name; various modifications; state employees; effective date.
Title
State government; Personnel Act; changing name; various modifications; state employees; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Accountability |
2014-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13 |
2014-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-10 | House | Amended |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 84 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 203 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 21 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 26 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 103a | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 63 | 7A | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 150 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5003 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 661 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |