OK HB3276 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; display of historical documents; authorizing Secretary of State to elect alternate location for preservation of the original State Constitution; effective date.
Title
State government; display of historical documents; authorizing Secretary of State to elect alternate location for preservation of the original State Constitution; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: States' Rights Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: States' Rights Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Mulready |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |