OK HB3240 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying certain good-cause exemptions under the Reading Sufficiency Act; emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying certain good-cause exemptions under the Reading Sufficiency Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Anderson [R] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Shelton, Sherrer, Hoskin, Nollan |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Scott, Kern |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |