OK HB3212 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; modifying certain parole consideration requirements; authorizing certain parole docket requests; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; modifying certain parole consideration requirements; authorizing certain parole docket requests; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie), Shelton |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 26 |
2014-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | Remove Representative Hickman as principal House author and substitute with Representative Billy |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |