OK HB3177 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
United States; directing Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department to control and maintain certain areas under certain circumstances; emergency.
Title
United States; directing Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department to control and maintain certain areas under certain circumstances; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: States' Rights Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: States' Rights Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | House | Approved by Governor 05/13/2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-07 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 6 |
2014-05-07 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Walker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 8 |
2014-03-05 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-05 | House | Amended |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Blackwell |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |