OK HB3142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; exemptions for qualifying manufacturing facilities; continuation based on damage to certain tangible personal property or improvements; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; exemptions for qualifying manufacturing facilities; continuation based on damage to certain tangible personal property or improvements; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-05-07 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2014-04-15 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 |
2014-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Jackson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |