OK HB3087 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; Oklahoma Turnpike Authority; increase emergency declaration contract authority; effective date.
Title
Public buildings and public works; Oklahoma Turnpike Authority; increase emergency declaration contract authority; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Transportation committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Transportation committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 33 |
2014-03-03 | House | General Order |
2014-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sanders |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |