OK HB3050 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; Long-Range Capital Planning Commission; in-kind transfers involving real property; procedures for liquidation and sale and lease of state-owned property; effective date.
Title
State government; Long-Range Capital Planning Commission; in-kind transfers involving real property; procedures for liquidation and sale and lease of state-owned property; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | House | Approved by Governor 05/13/2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-07 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-07 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-03-03 | House | Emergency removed |
2014-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 126 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 126 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 128 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 128 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 129 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 129 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 129 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 129 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 61 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |