OK HB3025 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Education; repealing the Post-secondary Oversight Council; effective date; emergency.
Title
Education; repealing the Post-secondary Oversight Council; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-10 | House | Remove Representative Shannon as principal House author and substitute with Representative Murphey |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-24 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Shannon |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |