OK HB3018 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Memorial highway designations; designating various memorial highways; effective date.
Title
Memorial highway designations; designating various memorial highways; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Rep. Scott Inman [D] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. Donnie Condit [D] |
Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Transportation committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Transportation committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor 05/12/2014 |
2014-05-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-06 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 |
2014-05-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2014-05-06 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2014-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Condit |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Hardin |
2014-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Wright |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2014-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Shelton |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3 |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sanders |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 198 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |