OK HB2966 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public safety; clarifying circumstances that require mandatory revocation; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety; clarifying circumstances that require mandatory revocation; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-08 - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-09 CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Thomsen
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
471142New CodeSee Bill Text
471168New CodeSee Bill Text
4714109New CodeSee Bill Text
4714116New CodeSee Bill Text
4714120New CodeSee Bill Text
472106New CodeSee Bill Text
4740102New CodeSee Bill Text
476111New CodeSee Bill Text
476205New CodeSee Bill Text
476209New CodeSee Bill Text
477503New CodeSee Bill Text
477602New CodeSee Bill Text
477603New CodeSee Bill Text
477605New CodeSee Bill Text
477606New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback