OK HB2909 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; modifying comprehensive professional risk management program; effective date.
Title
State government; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; modifying comprehensive professional risk management program; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-30 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4 |
2014-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-04-21 | Senate | coauthored by Dahm |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 7 |
2014-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Brumbaugh |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |