OK HB2906 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring certain individual to make certain designations; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring certain individual to make certain designations; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-15 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3; Ayes: 69 Nays: 10 |
2014-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough |
2014-05-15 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Emergency added |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |