OK HB2888 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying certain eligibility requirement; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying certain eligibility requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Anderson [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Walker, Hoskin |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Pittman, Ritze |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |