OK HB2874 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; making completion certificates valid for certain period of time; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; making completion certificates valid for certain period of time; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-20 | House | General Order |
2014-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Newell |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |