OK HB2831 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Mental health; relating to a real property trust; allowing certain tracts to be sold if certain determination is made; proceeds requirements; effective date.
Title
Mental health; relating to a real property trust; allowing certain tracts to be sold if certain determination is made; proceeds requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Martin (Scott) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 1 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |