OK HB2828 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to the Employees Insurance and Benefits Act; requiring the Office of Management and Enterprise Services to propose certain plan design; effective date.
Title
State government; relating to the Employees Insurance and Benefits Act; requiring the Office of Management and Enterprise Services to propose certain plan design; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-03-03 | House | Emergency removed |
2014-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |