OK HB2767 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring Medicare home care agency to adopt certain policy; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring Medicare home care agency to adopt certain policy; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Long-term Care and Senior Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Renegar |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |