OK HB2693 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; hearing aids; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; hearing aids; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Eric Proctor [D] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by Shelton |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 19 |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin, Walker, Proctor |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-17 | House | Title stricken |
2014-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2014-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Johnson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |