OK HB2679 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Child care; providing exception for school employee who has completed school criminal history record check; effective date.
Title
Child care; providing exception for school employee who has completed school criminal history record check; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |