OK HB2676 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Deleting certain recordings from exclusion of certain definition; effective date.
Title
Deleting certain recordings from exclusion of certain definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 32 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 32 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor 05/12/2014 |
2014-05-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-06 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 6 |
2014-05-06 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 13 |
2014-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Matthews, Hoskin |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Walker |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |