OK HB2630 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Retirement Security and Freedom Act; defined contribution system; contributions; procedures; effective date.
Title
Public retirement systems; Retirement Security and Freedom Act; defined contribution system; contributions; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] |
Rep. Mark McCullough [R] | Rep. Glen Mulready [R] | Rep. Michael Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/30/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Ayes: 62 Nays: 24 |
2014-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2014-05-20 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 33 |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | Motion to table CCR failed |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner, Mulready, McCullough |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR considered |
2014-05-19 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2014-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Brinkley, Mazzei, David, Brooks, Ballenger, Ivester |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Pensions committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 42 |
2014-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Osborn |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wesselhoft, Osborn |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 1316 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 913 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |