OK HB2629 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; making legislative findings regarding certain actions of the Governmental Accounting Standards Board; effective date.
Title
Public finance; making legislative findings regarding certain actions of the Governmental Accounting Standards Board; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 13 |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Brinkley, Mazzei, David, Brooks, Ballenger, Ivester |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Pensions committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Pensions |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |