OK HB2627 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Vetoed 04/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Vetoed 04/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; modifying prohibited employment by ABLE Commission personnel; effective date.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; modifying prohibited employment by ABLE Commission personnel; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Vetoed 04/29/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 17 |
2014-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Shumate (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-06 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Henke |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |