OK HB2625 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; Reading Sufficiency Act; modifying mandatory third-grade retention requirements; allowing promotions in certain instances; emergency.
Title
Schools; Reading Sufficiency Act; modifying mandatory third-grade retention requirements; allowing promotions in certain instances; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | House | Filed with Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure returned to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Veto overridden: Ayes: 79 Nays: 17 |
2014-05-20 | House | Vetoed 05/20/2014 |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2014-05-12 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2014-05-12 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds |
2014-05-12 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 6 |
2014-05-12 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Henke |
2014-05-12 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 6 |
2014-05-12 | House | Ayes: 83 Nays: 11 |
2014-05-12 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-05-12 | House | Ayes: 77 Nays: 15 |
2014-05-12 | House | Motion to reject SA's with instructions tabled |
2014-05-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman, Hulbert, McBride, Brown |
2014-05-12 | House | SAs considered |
2014-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Marlatt |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen, David, Allen, Ford |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Griffin |
2014-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman, Virgin, Ownbey |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 |
2014-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols, Bennett, Shelton, McCall, Hoskin, Cockroft, Sherrer |
2014-03-04 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Biggs, Smalley, Casey, Nollan, Cannaday, Scott, Condit |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Henke |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1210 | 508G | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508C | New Code | See Bill Text |