OK HB2617 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; clarifying certain prohibited acts; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; clarifying certain prohibited acts; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Martin [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Sharp, Barrington, Schulz, Holt, Burrage, Ivester |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Sharp (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Bennett |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Martin (Steve) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |