OK HB2603 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Medical Treatment Laws Information Act; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Medical Treatment Laws Information Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Hamilton [D] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Mike Christian [R] |
Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-10 | House | Amended |
2014-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Christian, Ritze |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs |
2014-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hamilton |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |