OK HB2592 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying documentation requirements; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying documentation requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Public Safety committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Public Safety committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Walker |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |