OK HB2576 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; notary public restrictions; providing that procedures apply to certain elections; effective date.
Title
Elections; notary public restrictions; providing that procedures apply to certain elections; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Griffin, Sparks, Burrage, Branan, Fields, David |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 2 |
2014-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-04 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hoskin |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |