OK HB2571 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; providing certain child to be considered as resident of originating school district for school purposes; effective date.
Title
Schools; providing certain child to be considered as resident of originating school district for school purposes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Common Education committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Common Education committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hoskin |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |