OK HB2568 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying penalty; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-14 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2014-05-14 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-24 | House | General Order |
2014-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Thomsen |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |