OK HB2554 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; requiring Oklahoma Board of Nursing to develop guidelines for certain nursing education programs; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; requiring Oklahoma Board of Nursing to develop guidelines for certain nursing education programs; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Approved by Governor 04/16/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Health Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 567 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 567 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 567 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |