OK HB2531 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Horse Racing Commission; purchase of motor vehicles; effective date.
Title
Horse Racing Commission; purchase of motor vehicles; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 32 Nays: 9 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 19 |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2014-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13 |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Floyd |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3A | 203 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 500 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |