OK HB2500 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying dates of certain education mandate allowances; requiring certain appropriations; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying dates of certain education mandate allowances; requiring certain appropriations; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. Donnie Condit [D] |
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Cannaday, Condit |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan |
2014-03-04 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Casey |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 16 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 16 | 114a | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 167 | New Code | See Bill Text |