OK HB2495 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporations; authorizing certain fire departments to establish fee schedule for services in response to an emergency; effective date.
Title
Corporations; authorizing certain fire departments to establish fee schedule for services in response to an emergency; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Public Safety committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Public Safety committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-13 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-13 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-13 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-13 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-07 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-07 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Fields, Barrington, Bingman, Justice, Ellis, Wyrick |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3 |
2014-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin, Cannaday, Sherrer, Hoskin |
2014-02-17 | House | General Order |
2014-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Casey |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |