OK HB2408 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying calculation of the four-year adjusted cohort graduation rate; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying calculation of the four-year adjusted cohort graduation rate; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Garrison (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Cannaday |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |