OK HB2378 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; eliminating liability for persons conducting certain approved projects; effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; eliminating liability for persons conducting certain approved projects; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Utility and Environmental Regulation committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Utility and Environmental Regulation committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4 |
2014-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-17 | House | General Order |
2014-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Grau |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |