OK HB2377 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Public Safety; increasing expense allowances; effective date.
Title
Department of Public Safety; increasing expense allowances; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Steve Vaughan [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3 |
2014-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-25 | House | Title stricken |
2014-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Vaughan |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |