OK HB2348 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Fisher, Hulbert, Cleveland, Blackwell, Moore, Roberts (Sean)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Fisher, Hulbert, Cleveland, Blackwell, Moore, Roberts (Sean)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Historical artifacts; authorizing certain entities to display historically significant documents; effective date.
Title
Historical artifacts; authorizing certain entities to display historically significant documents; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Gus Blackwell [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Arthur Hulbert [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Rep. Dan Fisher [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House: States' Rights committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Fisher, Hulbert, Cleveland, Blackwell, Moore, Roberts (Sean) |
2014-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Public Health Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bennett |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |