OK HB2329 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; adding exception to certain prohibited act; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; adding exception to certain prohibited act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Sen. Larry Boggs [R] | Rep. Mark McCullough [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Dan Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Fisher |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 17 |
2014-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough, Cockroft |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2014-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kern |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |