OK HB2232 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; creating Constitutional Challenge Litigation Cost Revolving Fund; Lupus Fund; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; creating Constitutional Challenge Litigation Cost Revolving Fund; Lupus Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2013-05-23 | Senate | SCs named Barrington, Jolley, Justice, Brinkley, Burrage, Sparks |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference |
2013-05-22 | House | HC's named: GCCA |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-17 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 3 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 15 |
2013-03-05 | House | Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2013-03-05 | House | General Order |
2013-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Dorman |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2368 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |