OK HB2219 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Human Services; requiring Department to issue family impact statement for every proposed rule; effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; requiring Department to issue family impact statement for every proposed rule; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Echols |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23 |
2013-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Kern |
2013-02-25 | House | General Order |
2013-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson |
2013-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Newell |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |