OK HB2172 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Health Care Authority; directing Authority to conduct bidding process to select a provider to perform an audit; effective date.
Title
Health Care Authority; directing Authority to conduct bidding process to select a provider to perform an audit; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 7 |
2013-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-12 | House | Amended |
2013-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-13 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |