OK HB1839 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-20 - CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; requiring criminal history background checks for certain persons; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; requiring criminal history background checks for certain persons; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-20 - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2013-02-07HouseReferred to Public Safety Committee
2013-02-07HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2013-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2013-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Williams
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
471114New CodeSee Bill Text
472106New CodeSee Bill Text
472306New CodeSee Bill Text
476101New CodeSee Bill Text
476105New CodeSee Bill Text
476110New CodeSee Bill Text
476111New CodeSee Bill Text
476114New CodeSee Bill Text
476115New CodeSee Bill Text
476205New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback