OK HB1658 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act; defining term; authorizing promulgation of rules; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act; defining term; authorizing promulgation of rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/13/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-09 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-09 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-25 | SA's received | |
2011-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-20 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-02-16 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Enns | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 161 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |