OK HB1581 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Health Care Authority; waiver for Medicaid and Medicare services; providing for effect of provisions with respect to federally recognized Native American tribes; effective date; emergency.
Title
Health Care Authority; waiver for Medicaid and Medicare services; providing for effect of provisions with respect to federally recognized Native American tribes; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Ballenger [D] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. William Fourkiller [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: Public Health and Social Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: Public Health and Social Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Bingman |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bingman |
2014-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Pittman, Sherrer, Shoemake |
2014-03-06 | House | General Order |
2014-02-24 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox, Fourkiller |
2014-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Scott |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |