OK HB1416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to the Quality Jobs Program Act; providing for incentive payments to certain proxy establishment; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to the Quality Jobs Program Act; providing for incentive payments to certain proxy establishment; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Rep. Scott Inman [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 2 CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8 |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-05-20 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman |
2014-05-16 | House | Remove Representative Hall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sears |
2014-05-16 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Further conference granted, GCCA |
2014-04-29 | House | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees |
2013-05-20 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2013-05-20 | House | CCR ruled nongermane |
2013-05-20 | House | CCR considered |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-05-13 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Loveless |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6 |
2013-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer |
2013-03-07 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2357 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 32A | New Code | See Bill Text |